Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Austin, Marion, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2020 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Re: Filing of the Second Account
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First Account
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Generic) Order Settling First Account and Report of Executor of the Person and Estate, Allowing Fees to Conservator and Attorney for Conservator cc emailed Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting First Account and Report of Conservator of the Person and Estate; Petition for its Approval, for Allowance of Fees to Conservator of the Estate and Fees to Conservator's Attorney Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration " HRG 10/19/21" Declaration of Deborah K. Boyett to Supplement the First Account and Report of Conservator of the Person and Estate, and Petition for Its Settlement and for Order Fixing and Allowing Compensation to Conservator and to Conservator's Attorney |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date: 10/19/2021 Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: 303 |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigator Review Report Fee for Investigation |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Post Move Notice of Change of Residence (G/C) | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Move Notice of Change of Residence (G/C) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.