Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ramirez, David T, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez, Carmela H, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mangano, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMangano, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney set by Glenn Wilson Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Old Atty: Glenn Wilson. New Atty: pro per. |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Initial OSC/Motion SS, PC set by Miguel Jimenez Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC/Motions filed hrg 04/14/21 @ 1:30 PM in dept 201 with zoom info emailed. |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration April 14, 2021 Dept 201 |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to: Dissolution |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Old Atty: pro per. New Atty: Miguel Jimenez. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.