Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wakimian, Sarkis, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Margaryan, Varduhi, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mangano, Robert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMangano, Robert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return Readiness
Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
FCS Session Set Tier 1 |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge Mangano minute order. See attached. | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Reissued Status Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge Mangano minute order. See attached. Dept: 201 Judge: Mangano Clerk: Z. De La Fuente Reporter: S. Applegate Petitioner: Present/Tomassian (Zoom) Respondent: Not Present/Shrayberman (crtrm) Hearing type: TROR The matter was previously continued for status to allow the parties to try and resolve pending issues. Attorney Shrayberman states there are still pending issues that the parties are trying to resolve and is requesting a continuance. Attorney Tomassian does not object. The court continues the matter for a status on 05/18/2021 at 8:30 a.m. The temporary restraining order issued remains in full force and effect until the next hearing. An Armenian interpreter will be needed at the next hearing. |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 4/6/21 Reissued Hearing to: 5/18/21 |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRO Order to Show Cause Reissued-status Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 2/16/21 Reissued Hearing to: 4/6/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.