Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Munoz, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Munoz Alvarado, Horacio, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with David C. Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid C. Kalemkarian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to:Dissolution of Marriage |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution with Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.