Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Adelson, Beverly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adelson, Michael Darren, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Lisa M. Gamoian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa M. Gamoian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution - No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Gamoian, Lisa |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order-Orders electronically mailed | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Letter | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing Mailed in SASE- Duplicate filing |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return Letter Copies denied default with envelopes and Judgment to Petitioner in SASE |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Denied No POSS on file for Amended Summons, Prop. Dec. missing page 4 adn page 2 on copies. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.