Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Intermex Wire Transfer Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Minassian, Natalia A., against Alqadhi, Mohamed Musa Abdulla, Family Discount Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCullers, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management128 days |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2020 |
Category09 Limited - Other Collections Over $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions176 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 03, 2020Order Denied
Date: October 13, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 22, 2020Amended Document Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granted RE: Accept Copy of Written Instrument in Lieu of Original Document Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family- Dec to Accept Copy Declaration Filed Decl and Order to use copy in lieu of original |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Discount - Default (5) Request for Court Judgment |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Discount - Declaration (3) Declaration Filed Declaration in support of default judgment |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Discount - CMC Case Management Statement Filed Case Management Statement |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Discount - Judgment (3) Judgment Received Forward to Dept 404 on 08/16/2021. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Order Denying Application for Default Judgment Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.