Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
California Business Properties Association, California Cattlemen'S Association, California Construction And Industrial Materials Association, California Farm Bureau Federation, California Manufacturers And Technology Association, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) 02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate case represented by Harrison, Mark D., against California Fish And Game Commission, Edwards Solar, Llc, Terra-Gen Development Company, Llc, represented by Reusch, Jeffrey P., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Culver Kapetan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCulver Kapetan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
Category02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Order Received for Signature
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: December 22, 2020Proof of Service
Date: January 06, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 19, 2021Request Filed
Date: January 11, 2021Reply filed
Date: January 11, 2021Reply filed
Date: January 11, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 11, 2021Proof of Service
Date: January 11, 2021Objection filed
Date: January 11, 2021Objection filed
Date: January 11, 2021Objection filed
Date: January 11, 2021Reply filed
Date: January 11, 2021Opposition filed
Date: January 06, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 22, 2020Opposition filed
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 22, 2020Request Filed
Date: December 21, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 15, 2020Response filed
Date: December 15, 2020Reply filed
Date: December 15, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 11, 2020Objection filed
Date: December 11, 2020Opposition filed
Date: December 11, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 09, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 08, 2020Order Granted
Date: December 10, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 03, 2020Order filed
Date: December 03, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: December 08, 2020Application Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 03, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 02, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 02, 2020Ex parte Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: December 01, 2020Request Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 01, 2020Amended Document Filed
Date: November 23, 2020Petition - Writ of Mandate
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Mandate
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Submission or Advisement | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter Shelly Davis Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & CM |
|
February 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: California Business Properties Association v. California Fish and Game Commission Superior Court Case No. 20CECG03125 Hearing Date: February 4, 2022 (Dept. 403) Motion: Petition for Writ of Mandat... | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request Filed Request for Presence of Court Reporter, and Statement of Intent to Provide Court Reporter |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
12/30/21 - Reply to Intervenor's Opposition to Opening Brief Reply filed to Intervenor's Opposition to Opening Brief |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
12/30/21 - Reply to Opposition Brief Reply filed to Opposition Brief |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
12/28/21 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE Notice Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition filed Opposition Brief of Respondent California Fish and Game Commission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.