Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rigney, Fern, filed a(n) 16 Unlimited - Fraud case represented by Weber, Barry Ernest, against Macris, Donna, represented by Krbechek, Randolf, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
Category16 Unlimited - Fraud |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges elder financial abuse, accounting, and constructive trust violations. The plaintiff, Fern Rigney, is an 87-year-old widow who lived in Fresno County, California. The defendant, Donna Macris, is Fern's daughter. The complaint al...
Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 08, 2022Trial brief filed
Date: December 05, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: June 06, 2022Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: June 07, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Estimated 2 to 3 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
12.09.22 Trial Readiness Minute Order and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order Attachment 12.09.22 Trial Readiness Minute and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeared in Person | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
12.08.22 Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline Notice Filed Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
12.08.22 Motion to continue Pretrial Meeting and Trial; MPAs and Declaration of Donna Macris Notice Filed Motion to continue Pretrial Meeting and Trial; MPAs and Declaration of Donna Macris |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief as filed Trial brief filed Trial Brief |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.