Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Thomas, Heather, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Balakian, David V., against Scruggs, Matthew, Scruggs, Melissa, represented by Demaria, Anthony N., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateJune 17, 2020 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 17, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Transfer of Fees Completed For WEB-2020-65862 |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Deposit Notice Filed |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee Answer Filed |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed Case Management Statement |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Deposit, payment,disbursment of Jury Fees |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing Re: Time Change |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing Re: Time Change |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing CMC set for 10/21/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.