Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
San Bernardino Valley Municipal Water District, filed a(n) 02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate case against California Department Of Fish And Wildlife Service, California Department Of Water Resources, represented by Moffat, Corey, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management111 days |
Filing DateMay 28, 2020 |
Category02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Notice Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Continued Case Management Conference | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Continued Case Management Conference | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Continued Case Management Conference |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Order assigning Coordiation Trial Judge |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Notice Filed Change of Handling Attorney within the same Law Firm |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Continued Case Management Conference |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.