Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dg-Huron, Ca-1, Lp, Embree Asset Group, Inc., filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case represented by Hillison, Robert K., against City Manager Jack Castro, City Of Huron, Councilmember Hilda R. Plasencia, Councilmember Jorge Solorio, Councilmember Roberto C. Pimentel, (total of 5) See All represented by Slater, Michael G., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management12 days |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Civil case cover sheet
Date: May 08, 2020Summons issued and filed
Date: May 20, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Embree Development Group, Inc. v. City of Huron Superior Court Case No. 20CECG01450 Hearing Date: June 27, 2023 Motion: Defendant City of Huron’s Motion for Attorney’s Fees Tentative Ruling: To gr... | |
May 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Embree Development Group, Inc. v. City of Huron Superior Court Case No. 20CECG01450 Hearing Date: May 31, 2023 (Dept. 502) Motion: Defendant City of Huron’s Motion for Attorney’s Fees Tentative Ru... | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
11/11/22 Judgment Judgment Received *order signed and fwd to clerks office on 11/16/22* Forward to: 403 |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter Greta Gregory Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Via Courtcall Atty Richard Crowe for Plaintiffs |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Atty Stan Blythe for Plaintiffs; Atty Michael Slater for Defendants |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.