Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
226 North Shirley Avenue Fresno Ca 93727, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSimpson, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2020 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time11 days |
Order Granted
Date: June 11, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: June 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granted to return funds deposited with the Court in the sum of $35,759.73 Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 502 Order for: (Proposed) Order For Return Of Funds Deposited With Clerk of Court |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Order filed Ruling/On Petition to deposit surplus funds Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Deposit, payment,disbursment Interest Bearing Funds $35,759.73 |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale Petition filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.