Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alfonso And Rose D'Argenzio Family Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Nussbaum Lane, against Wealth Financial Life Insurance Services Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with William D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam D. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2020 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Application for Order to Post
Date: January 04, 2021Proof of Service by Posting
Date: January 13, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 12/07/2020)
Date: December 07, 2020Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Sanctions including Dismissal for ...))
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Wealth Financial Life Insurance Services, Inc.))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Writ - Return ((Los Angeles) Possession Only)
Date: February 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession
Date: February 01, 2021Complaint
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: February 01, 2021Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 01, 2021Supplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.