Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nichols Jacqueline, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Schelly Thomas H., against Oasis Nail Spa Alameda Inc., Oasis Nails & Spa Magnolia Inc., Phan Michelle, Thai Loan Thi, represented by Yu Tom, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUpinder S. Kalra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseBurbank |
Complaint
Date: September 11, 2020Default entered as to Loan Thi Thai; On the Complaint filed by Jacqueline Nichols on
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Default entered as to Oasis Nail Spa Alameda, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Jacqueline Nichols on
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Jacqueline Nichols on
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Jacqueline Nichols on
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order RE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Declaration OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Declaration OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Jacqueline Nichols on
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Declaration OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Jacqueline Nichols on
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jacqueline Nichols (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE ADVANCING OSC RE SERVICE))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGHI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGHI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order TO DELETE MINUTE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 04, 2022))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) of )
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGID IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGHI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Summary of the Case (in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Court)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Summary of the Case (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Summary of the Case (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT) of )
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Summary of the Case (in Support of Application for Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment])
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Request (FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment as to remai...))
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment as to remai...) of )
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jacqueline Nichols in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SET ON FEBRUARY 07, 2022 ...))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE ADVANCING OSC RE SERVICE))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice (OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGHI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Summary of the Case (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT) of 12/06/2021)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment])
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGHI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Summary of the Case (in Support of Application for Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/11/2022)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGID IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Summary of the Case (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) of 01/26/2022)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF VOLLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Summary of the Case (in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Court)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Request (FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF JULIAN BELLENGHI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order TO DELETE MINUTE ORDER OF FEBRUARY 04, 2022))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SET ON FEBRUARY 07, 2022 ...))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jacqueline Nichols in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice (OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACQUELINE NICHOLS RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.