Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Netty An Individual Max, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Metson Philip A., against Clemens An Individual Mark R., represented by Dannemeyer Bruce, Datzker Leigh Alan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank with William D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam D. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseBurbank |
Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: MARK R. CLEMENS, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; Filed by: MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARK R. CLEMENS, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: September 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 09, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 09, 2020Complaint
Date: September 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: September 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER
Date: September 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 05, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 23, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: October 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCING HEARING RE OSC RE SERVICE)
Date: November 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 03, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARK R. CLEMENS, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by MARK R. CLEMENS, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: December 23, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of Pendency of Action) Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint) Filed by MARK R. CLEMENS, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Order) Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE ADVANCING HEARING RE OSC RE SERVICE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference) Filed by MAX NETTY, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re NOTICE OF RELATED CASE))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of Order)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) of 09/17/2020)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Pendency of Action)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE ADVANCING HEARING RE OSC RE SERVICE))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.