Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Walling Erica, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Russell Dennis, against K.O.B. Remodeling Inc. Dba 1 Stop Builders, represented by Florentin Michael H, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: K.O.B. Remodeling Inc., dba 1 Stop Builders (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: K.O.B. Remodeling Inc., dba 1 Stop Builders (Defendant)
Date: September 17, 2021Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Erica Walling (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration of Dennis Russel Esq Re OSC/Dismissal; Filed by: Erica Walling (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: K.O.B. Remodeling Inc., dba 1 Stop Builders (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Erica Walling (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: K.O.B. Remodeling Inc., dba 1 Stop Builders (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (Statement in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injection)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Erica Walling in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion For A Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten TIme and Grant Motion))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Shorten TIme and Grant Motion)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration (of Complaint and Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Dennis Russel Esq Re OSC/Dismissal)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration of Complaint and Stay...))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Stay Should Not Be Lifted))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.