Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mo Xiaojun, Zhan Sheng, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Newell Ruben R., Wu Sam, against Zhan Sheng, represented by Ching David T., Wong Dixon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management117 days |
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff); As to: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant); As to: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Declaration Supporting; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Cross-Defendant); As to: Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: David T. Ching (Attorney)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff); As to: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff); As to: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order to Continue Trial and Discovery; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff); As to: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant); As to: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant); As to: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Lodging Transcript; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for remote trial; Signed and Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 08, 2023Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 08, 2023Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 08, 2023Witness List; Filed by: Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Stipulation and Order for Remote Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (Supporting) Filed by Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Plaintiff and Plaintiff...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial) Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by David T. Ching (Attorney)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Answer Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI) Filed by Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Other - (Identification of Trade Secrets CCP 2019.210) Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for remote trial) Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial and Discovery) Filed by Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Sheng Zhan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Sheng Zhan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Xiaojun Mo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stipulation to Attend Private Mediati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Declarations in support)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Response (to OSC re: Sanctions For Failure To Appear At CMC on 10/14/20; Declaration in Support)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Objection (Evidence Objections in support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of 10/23/2020)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Other - (Identification of Trade Secrets CCP 2019.210)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Notice (of Errata for Plaintiff's Cross Complaint; Declaration of David T. Ching)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Plaintiff and Plaintiff...))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of 05/05/2021)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Reply (to Xiaojun Mo's Opposition for a Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.