Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Setmajer Kali Summer, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 15, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 15, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: November 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND F...)
Date: December 07, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: December 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)
Date: February 08, 2021Proof of Publication
Date: February 08, 2021Decree Changing Name
Date: February 08, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Appear and F...))
Date: December 07, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: December 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 11/04/2020)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.