Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vicente Gabriela M. filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Gabriela M. Vicente (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Gabriela M. Vicente (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: May 03, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Gabriela M. Vicente) Filed by Gabriela M. Vicente (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Status of Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Publication Filed by Gabriela M. Vicente (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Declaration of Gabriela M. Vicente; Filed by: Gabriela M. Vicente (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Gabriela M. Vicente (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Status of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Name Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by:
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Status of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 10/21/2020)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Zachariah V. Pierce, Autumn Ember Vicente and Daniel Ray Pierce III)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Gabriela M. Vicente)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Status of Related Cases) of 01/21/2021)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.