Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Swift Financial Llc F K A Swift Financial Corporation As Servicing Agent For Webbank Successor In Interest To Celtic Bank Corporation, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Schlecter Daren M., against Boots Better Living Llc A California Corporation, Jordan Staci, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Stephen Morgan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen Morgan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management118 days |
Filing DateJune 25, 2020 |
CategoryPetition To Compel/Confirm/Vacate Arbitration (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of 12/29/2020)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference and Hearing on Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.