Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patience Robles, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 1993 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - SCHER & BASSETT BASSETT, WILLIAM H. 465 SOUTH MATHILDA AVE. #210 SUNNYVALE, CA 94086 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 15, 1994 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement of Receipt: Transfer Text = MOTION Description RECEIPT ON TRANSFER RETURNED & FILED NEW MUNI.CT.#DC94292639 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 30, 1994 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change of Venue To Text = Result Text: NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF VENUE TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY 6/30/94 Decision = M Closed = 06/30/1994 |
|
June 30, 1994 | Docket Event |
Notice: Transmittal (Transfer Out) Text = MOTION Description RECORD OF TRANSFER OUT TO MUNI COURT (SANTA CLARA COUNTY) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 11, 1994 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Department 13 |
|
May 11, 1994 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 13 |
|
May 05, 1994 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Text = MOTION Description SETTLEMENT CONF STATEMENT OF WOODLAND HOMEOWNERS BY JOSH SHINNICK FOR 5/11/94 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 26, 1994 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management after mediation
Judge: Department 13 |
|
April 22, 1994 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description CASE MGMT CONF QUESTIONNAIRE BY J. SHINNICK Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.