Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Msw Capital Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harris &Amp; Zide, against Garcia, Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeauchesne, Roger M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: January 16, 2019Civil Complaint
Date: December 26, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Beauchesne, Roger M. |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default Judgment | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non-Military Status | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Waiver | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default - Entered | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Package Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.