Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nelson &Amp; Kennard, against Choatekagel, Brittany Claire, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2017 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request for Court Judgment
Date: January 03, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: June 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Party Only Request for Entry of Default - Not Entered |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment/Order | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Accrued Interest on Money Judgment | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Package Received | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.