Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Debt Resolve Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian &Amp; Miele Llp, against Machado, Jessica A, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2017 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Judgment
Date: January 30, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: April 05, 2017Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: January 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2028 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Determining Claim of Exemption | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Opposition to Claim of Exemption Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Opposition to Claim of Exemption | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Opposition to Claim of Exemption | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Confidential Statement of Jgmt Debtor's Social Security No |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.