Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ids Property Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mendelson, Lee M, Esq., against Bargas, Leandra, Herd, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2017 |
CategoryUninsured Motorist: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 21, 2017Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: December 14, 2017Request for Court Judgment
Date: December 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Facts Issued | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration - CCP 585 & 1033 Declaration |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.