Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kirkland, Brandie, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Underwood, Angela, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Harassment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Court Trial Before Evidence | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.