Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Henault, Michael, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Chenault Law, Thompson, Terrance J, Esq., Johnson, Leigh E, against American Land & Leisure, California Department Of Parks & Recreation, State Of California, Williams, Robert Howard, represented by Livingston Law Firm, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: June 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
March 23, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Defendant Robert Howard Williams to Answer Deposition Questions; Request for Sanctions – MOOT. The Court notes that the pending matter is MOOT; a Notice of Settlement of E...
Judge: Timothy W. Salter |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Opposition | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.