Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2021 |
CategoryMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF VENTURA VENTURA MINUTE ORDER DATE: 12/02/2022 TIME: 08:15:00 AM DEPT: 22B TEMPORARY JUDGE: Kelly Berlingeri CLERK: Maria Martinez REPORTER/ERM: None CASE NO: 56... | |
April 22, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF VENTURA VENTURA MINUTE ORDER DATE: 04/22/2022 TIME: 08:15:00 AM DEPT: 22B TEMPORARY JUDGE: Lori M. Dobrin CLERK: James Beltran REPORTER/ERM: None CASE NO: 56-20... | |
December 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF VENTURA VENTURA DIVISION TENTATIVE RULINGS EVENT DATE: 12/10/2021 EVENT TIME: 08:20:00 AM DEPT.: 40 JUDICIAL OFFICER: Mark Borrell CASE NUM: 56-2019-00533378-CU...
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
December 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF VENTURA VENTURA MINUTE ORDER DATE: 12/10/2021 TIME: 08:20:00 AM DEPT: 40 JUDICIAL OFFICER PRESIDING: Mark Borrell CLERK: Penny Wooff REPORTER/ERM: None CASE NO:...
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.