Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bunnell, Bill, Bunnell, Kim, filed a(n) Civil case against Amerispec Inspection Services Inc, Century 21 M&M & Assoc, Goesch, Audrey, Gosselin, Tami, Great Valley Realtors Inc, (total of 11) See All represented by Borton Petrini, Llp, Dambacher, Gary P, Esq., Newman &Amp; Broomand Llp, Triebsch &Amp; Frampton, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeauchesne, Roger M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 10, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 10, 2018Opposition
Date: April 18, 2018Law & Motion
Date: June 06, 2017Law & Motion
Date: April 04, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 29, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: April 04, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 21, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: February 13, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 22, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 29, 2016Order
Date: July 10, 2017Separate Statement
Date: May 05, 2017Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: February 21, 2017Answer
Date: January 11, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 18, 2016Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: February 06, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 06, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 16, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 20, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 14, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 09, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 17, 2017Separate Statement
Date: February 13, 2018Order
Date: May 23, 2017Order
Date: November 07, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: June 30, 2017Law & Motion
Date: May 04, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: February 13, 2018Law & Motion
Date: October 18, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 05, 2018Order Granted
Date: December 28, 2018Reply to Opposition
Date: April 26, 2018Separate Statement
Date: April 18, 2018Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full
Date: April 09, 2020Law & Motion
Date: April 26, 2018Opposition to Motion
Date: April 26, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 10, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 15, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 04, 2018Request for Dismissal - Cross-Complaint
Date: May 31, 2018Objection
Date: May 04, 2018Order
Date: August 01, 2018Request for Dismissal - Not Entered
Date: November 10, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: May 03, 2018Order
Date: June 29, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: June 15, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: June 11, 2018Order
Date: June 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 07, 2018Objection
Date: April 27, 2018Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: February 20, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: May 09, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: October 05, 2018Order of Examination
Date: January 29, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 29, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: May 01, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: May 08, 2018Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: November 12, 2020Reply to Opposition
Date: April 27, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: December 15, 2015Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: February 23, 2018Memorandum
Date: April 26, 2018Memorandum
Date: April 20, 2018Separate Statement
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 02, 2017Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: May 05, 2017Answer
Date: October 12, 2016Stipulation & Order to ADR
Date: October 15, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 20, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 23, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: January 10, 2018Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 15, 2017Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 28, 2018Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: June 11, 2018Opposition
Date: April 26, 2018Memorandum
Date: April 18, 2018Opposition
Date: April 13, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 13, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: June 01, 2017Response
Date: April 26, 2018Opposition
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: January 23, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 30, 2017Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: March 09, 2017Order Granted
Date: September 24, 2018Answer
Date: September 25, 2017Memorandum of Costs
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: November 20, 2017Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 16, 2017Answer
Date: September 23, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Not Entered | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Case Management Conference Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.