Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Humeston, Brent, Ridenour, Kailani, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Walkup Melodia Kelly &Amp; Schoenberger, Mastagni Holstedt, against Parker, Angela, Parker, Seth, Parker, Austin, Humeston, Susan Lynn, Parker, Austin Adam, (total of 6) See All represented by Rushford &Amp; Bonotto Llp, Gates &Amp; Linn Llp, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Silveira, Marie Sovey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilveira, Marie Sovey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Consolidated | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.