Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Watkins, Nikki, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Putnam, Martin, Esq., against Carmax Auto Superstores California Llc, Santander Consumer Usa Inc, represented by Schlichter &Amp; Shonack, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Silveira, Marie Sovey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilveira, Marie Sovey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional
Date: July 05, 2018Separate Statement
Date: April 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case 070518 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Pleading- Not Routine | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.