We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Futura Industries Vs Alumtile, Inc., Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Futura Industries, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Hooshang Homara, Alumtile, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Joseph Huber presiding.

Case Details for Futura Industries v. Hooshang Homara , et al.

Judge

Joseph Huber Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

August 15, 2014

Category

Other Collections Unlimited (09)

Last Refreshed

December 01, 2021

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Santa Clara County, CA

Matter Type

Collections

Filing Court House

Santa Clara

Case Cycle Time

369 days

Parties for Futura Industries v. Hooshang Homara , et al.

Plaintiffs

Futura Industries

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Hooshang Homara

Alumtile, Inc.

Other Parties

Ruth V. Glick (Arbitrator)

Steven J. Johnson (Arbitrator)

Case Events for Futura Industries v. Hooshang Homara , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 08/24/2015
Hearing Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Judge: Department 21

Docket Event Request: Dismissal
Text = atty Lorna Walker Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/27/2015
Docket Event Notice: Settlement
Text = CONDITIONAL; ATTY LORNA WALKER Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 07/07/2015
Hearing Review: Arbitration Order

Judge: Department 21

Hearing Review: Arbitration Order

Judge: Department 2

Docket Event Order: Arbitration after CMC
Text = discovery to remain open until 30 days before trial Legacy Name = CV Ord to Arb at CMC Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2015
Docket Event Notice of Hearing
Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Arb Ord Rev Hearing Decision = M Closed = 01/21/2015
Docket Event Statement: Case Management Conference
Text = d. herns Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2014
Docket Event Order: Arbitration after CMC
Text = discovery to remain open until 30 days before trial Legacy Name = CV Ord to Arb at CMC Decision = V Closed = 12/26/2014
See all events