We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

M. Lindsey Vs H. Martinez, Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago

Michael Lindsey, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ram Fletcher, against Gloria Martinez, Hector Avila Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clarawith Franklin E. Bondonno presiding.

Case Details

Filing Date

October 19, 2012

Last Refreshed

December 01, 2021

Filing Location

Santa Clara County, CA

Filing Court House

Santa Clara

Judge

Franklin E. Bondonno Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Auto Unlimited (22)

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Cycle Time

286 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Events

Type Description
Hearing Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status

Judge: Department 9

Docket Event Request: Dismissal CESC
Text = ATTY RAM FLETCHER Legacy Name = CV Req Dism w/Prej (CESC) Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2013
Docket Event Arbitration: Other Action
Text = Invouce approved and routed to Finance Dept. 7-5-13 Legacy Name = CV Other Arb Action Decision = M Closed = 07/05/2013

Judge: Franklin E. Bondonno

Docket Event Notice: Entry of Order
Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 06/14/2013
Docket Event Stipulation and Order: ADR
Text = CESC Neutral appointed 5-14-13, Robert S Luft 6-25-13 Legacy Name = CV ADR Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2013

Judge: Carol W. Overton

Docket Event Clerk's Notice
Text = CESC Neutral Robert S Luft appointed 5-14-13 sent Legacy Name = CV Clerk's Notice Decision = M Closed = 05/14/2013

Judge: Carol W. Overton

Hearing Conference: Further Case Management

Judge: Department 9

Docket Event Statement: Case Management Conference
Text = Atty. Fletcher Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 04/12/2013
Hearing Conference: Further Case Management

Judge: Department 9

Docket Event Statement: Case Management Conference
Text = a. d. holland Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 02/20/2013
See all events