Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ca-Skyport I Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Joseph H. Schieffer, against Marin Seng, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Franklin E. Bondonno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFranklin E. Bondonno Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2012 |
CategoryCommercial Unlawful Detainer Unlimited (31) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions20 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ: Possession (Filed) Text = Issued 7/11/12; Santa Clara. Legacy Name = CV Writ of Possess/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 09/28/2012 Judge: Franklin E. Bondonno |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Text = pre-judgment claim not served Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/11/2012 |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ: Possession (Issued) Text = 50 Skyport Dr, Suite 10, San Jose, CA 95110 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Possess Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 07/11/2012 |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 07/11/2012 |
|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Clerk's Judgment for Possession Text = 50 Skyport Dr, Suite 10, San Jose, CA 95110 Legacy Name = CV Clerk's Judgment for Possession Decision = M Closed = 07/11/2012 |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/21/2012 |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/21/2012 |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/21/2012 |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.