Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jacqueline Jones, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Thinh Vu, represented by Michael R Welch, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Franklin E. Bondonno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFranklin E. Bondonno Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2012 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time415 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 20 |
|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = ATTY JOSHUA R. JACHIMOWICZ Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2013 |
|
July 25, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 7 |
|
June 10, 2013 | Hearing |
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 20 |
|
June 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement Jury
Judge: Department 20 |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = by atty Joshua Jachimowicz Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2013 |
|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Text = Atty Albie Jachimowicz - 6-5-13 9:00 D20 Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2013 Judge: Kevin E. McKenney |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Fee Deposit Text = $150 jury deposit by def Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 05/16/2013 |
|
March 12, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 20 |
|
December 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.