Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against All Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien Or Interest, Onewest Bank, Fsb, Digna L Cabrera, Eliseo C Cabrera, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Franklin E. Bondonno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFranklin E. Bondonno Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 05, 2012 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 9 |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Text = ntc of withdrawal of pendency of action (case already dismissed 7/30/12) Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2012 Judge: Franklin E. Bondonno |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Filed by Atty Mark Townsend, Jr. Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2012 |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2012 |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2012 |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.