Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Archers Capital Group, Inc., filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Valley View Packing, Llc, represented by Steven A. Ellenberg, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Kevin E. McKenney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin E. McKenney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time102 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration
Judge: Department 20 |
|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Atty Roger D. Wintle Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/28/2012 |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Text = to continue hearing on petition to compel arbitration from 2-2-12 t 4-10-12 9:00 D20 Granted by Judge McKenney Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order Decision = G Closed = 02/02/2012 Judge: Kevin E. McKenney |
|
February 02, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration
Judge: Department 20 |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = Taken on Stip & Order to Continue Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2012 |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/04/2012 |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel Arbitration Text = by plaintiff, hrg 2/2/12 @ 9:00 a.m. in dept. 20 (Roger D. Wintle) Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Hrg:Petn to Compel Arb Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2011 Judge: Kevin E. McKenney |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = to compel arbitration Legacy Name = CV Petn:UnLtd |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Text = civil case cover sheet missing Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2011 |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.