Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
William Moller, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Elina L. Mckenzie, Louis A. Borge, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary E. Arand Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions199 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1672 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) | |
September 27, 2012 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 9 |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default Text = Total Judgment: $32,200.75 -- signed by Judge Derek Woodhouse Legacy Name = CV Default Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 09/13/2012 |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document W. Moller vs L. Borge, et al |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Text = Re: Court Judgment -- No parties listed in 5a of the Judgment Form Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2012 |
|
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/02/2012 |
|
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Text = (Court's) Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 08/02/2012 |
|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: Default Judgment not entered Text = PLT has not calculated the interest or court costs correctly. Legacy Name = CV Ord:Rejection Letter Decision = M Closed = 07/26/2012 |
|
July 19, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 9 |
|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 07/23/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.