Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Joseph Louis Wucher, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Amresco Independence Funding, Inc., Business Loan Center, Inc., Ciena Capital, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with William J. Elfving presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J. Elfving Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited (37) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction FULL |
|
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Remittitur H040882 Respondent to recover costs. Pursuant to the request of the appellant, the appeal filed on March 27, 2014, is dismissed. |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2015 |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte Text = GRANTED, extending time for plt to file mtn for atty's fees. atty Wolf Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Stip/Order Decision = G Closed = 10/26/2015 |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Remittitur Text = CASE# H040882 PARTIAL REMITTITUR - THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. APPEAL AS TO THE JANUARY 23, 2014 ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO SET ASIDE IS DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY.THE APPEAL AS TO THE MARCH 5, 2014 ORDER IS DISMISSED TO THE EXTENT IT SEEKS TO CHALLENGE ISSUES WHICH COULD HAVE BEEN RAISED ON DIRECT APPEAL FROM THE ORIGINAL MAY 23, 2013 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE APPEAL MAY PROCEED ONLY AS TO THE AMENDED JUDGMENT DATED 3/5/14, AWARDING ADDITIONAL ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS.; Legacy Name = CV Remittitur Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2015 Judge: William J. Elfving |
|
August 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 6 |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Text = re (Atty J. Wolf) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 06/29/2015 |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Text = Complaint w/o Prejudice as to Def Amresco Independence Funding, Inc. Only (Kathleen F. Sherman) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 06/11/2015 |
|
February 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty wolf Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 02/04/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.