Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Zions First National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Martin D. Goodman, against Chet Kapoor, Neeta Kapoor, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time159 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = plt, contract Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 02/15/2012 |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/04/2012 |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2011 |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2011 |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2011 |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.