Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tasha Gajsek, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Nayar Sadik, Saeed Sadik, represented by Santana Vierra & Symonds, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Pierce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time491 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2013 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 9 |
|
March 18, 2013 | Hearing |
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 9 |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Filed by Atty Robert Piering Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/18/2013 |
|
March 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement Jury
Judge: Department 9 |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = ATTY ROBERT A. PIERING Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2013 |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Text = Representing attorney is not attorney of record. Please submit a substitution of attorney. Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2013 |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = re: Old: Atty Pritesh S. Kothary New: Atty Lawrence E. Hart Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 01/11/2013 |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Association/Co-Counsel Text = Associating Atty Lawerence Hart Legacy Name = CV Association of Attys Decision = M Closed = 12/26/2012 |
|
November 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 9 |
|
September 06, 2012 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.