Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dennis R Teifeld, John Kevin Crowley, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Angie Robbiano, Daniel Herns, Dave Tang, Jeff Lerner, Matthew Garrett, (total of 10) See All represented by Daniel W. Ballesteros, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Pierce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryBusiness Tort/Unfair Bus Prac Unlimited (07) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time664 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2013 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 9 |
|
October 16, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Department 9 |
|
August 29, 2013 | Hearing | Reserved: Summary Judgment | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Filed by atty Nicholas Emanuel Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/28/2013 |
|
May 21, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 9 |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty ballesteros Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2013 |
|
March 12, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 9 |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = Atty Ballesteros Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 02/25/2013 |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order: Demurrer Text = Defs' Demurrer to the 2nd Amended Complaint is OVERRULED. Defs' Mtn to Strike the 2nd Amended Complaint is DENIED. (Judge Pierce) hrg 1/24/13 9am D-9 *nsase/ncp Legacy Name = CV Order on Demurrer Decision = D Closed = 02/19/2013 Judge: Mark H. Pierce |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response (No Fee) Text = Atty Protas Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE! Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.