Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian N. Winn, against Phong D Le, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Pierce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 9 |
|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs P. Le |
|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default Text = $58,126.30 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 1033 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Waiver: Attorney Fees Legacy Name = CV Waiver of Atty Fees Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Interest Legacy Name = CV Decl:Interest Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = re: Underlying action of account stated Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Text = does 1-10 Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Text = clerk Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/25/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.