Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Nada Shanawany, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Carol W. Overton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol W. Overton Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time2619 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) 07/27/15, Los Angeles, Unsatisfied |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Unsatisfied, Los Angeles, Issued 11/8/2016 Judge: Carol W. Overton |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) AGAINSTL Nada Shanawany - Los ANgeles $31,715.46 |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs COST: $381.40: CREDIT: $8,117.22: DATE: 05-20-16 |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/30/2015 |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = LA, $39,426.28 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 08/13/2015 |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Text = former;Zwicker and Associates Newl; Elizabeth A. Bleier Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 08/13/2015 |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = Credit:$8,117.22 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 08/13/2015 |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = re Return from Santa Clara Co. (Atty M.Hoffmann) Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 01/30/2014 |
|
June 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.