Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Edward N. Ajlouny filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Lucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions182 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time291 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Filed by Attys Daniel Price and Edward Ajlouny Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/09/2012 |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty Price Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 10/04/2012 |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = atty lien; declaration of Edward N. Ajlouny Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 09/13/2012 |
|
August 28, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = re (Atty D. Price) Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2012 |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = Atty Ajlouny Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 08/20/2012 |
|
August 14, 2012 | Hearing |
Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Judge: Department 2 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Amendment Text = Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication by Plt (Edward N. Ajlouny) 8-14-12 @9am in d-2 Legacy Name = CV Amendment to ... Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2012 Judge: Patricia M. Lucas |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Text = to Def's Opposition to Summary Judgment/Adjudication by Plt (Edward N. Ajlouny) 8-14-12 @9am in d-2 Legacy Name = CV Reply Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2012 Judge: Patricia M. Lucas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.