Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Darlene Sanchez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Westgate Beauty Store And Salon, Inc., Federal Realty Investment Trust, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Kevin E. McKenney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin E. McKenney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2011 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time717 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2013 |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = with Prejudice as to Complaint/filed by Attorney Lauren Gelber (This closes the case) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 11/25/2013 |
|
June 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order to Show Cause
Judge: Department 20 |
|
May 09, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 20 |
|
March 28, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 20 |
|
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = re (Atty B. Larsen) Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2013 |
|
February 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 20 |
|
January 31, 2013 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 20 |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = atty Brian L. Larsen Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 01/29/2013 |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = l. e. hart Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 01/22/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.