Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Roy D Roat, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2011 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time209 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2012 | Hearing | Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Atty Sanita Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2012 |
|
May 29, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Non-Service Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 01/11/2012 |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/23/2011 |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/23/2011 |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/23/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.