Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Advantel Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cupertino Inn, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Purged | |
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2006 |
|
March 10, 2006 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 96 |
|
February 07, 2006 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 97 |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff's Claim/<13,non-Gov |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.