Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fry'S Electronics, Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Bel Merit Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Purged | |
February 23, 2006 | Hearing | Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant | |
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/28/2006 |
|
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff's Claim/>12,non-Gov Closed = 03/01/2006 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.