Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fredric A Perez, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2006 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2006 | Hearing | Hearing: Waiver Accounting/Final Distribution | |
July 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order: Final Distribution Text = granting petition for final distribution on waiver of accounting, & for allowance of compensation for atty fees Legacy Name = PR Ord:Final Distribution Decision = G Closed = 07/17/2006 |
|
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Text = supplement to petition for final distribution on waiver of accounting Legacy Name = PR Supplemental Decision = M Closed = 07/14/2006 |
|
July 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = 07/17/06; w/proof of svc Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2006 |
|
July 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = on waiver of accounting and or allowance of compensation, pd $40.00 Legacy Name = PR Petn:Final Distribution Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2006 |
|
July 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Waiver Text = accounting signed Dutch A. Perez Legacy Name = PR Waiver of.... Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2006 |
|
June 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisal Text = Final Appraisal Total By Referee $308,387.75 Legacy Name = PR Inventory & Appraisement Decision = M Closed = 06/22/2006 |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Letters: Admin Legacy Name = PR Ltrs of Admin Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2006 |
|
February 02, 2006 | Hearing | Hearing: Letters of Administration | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order: Appoint Administrator Text = Frederic A. Perez, no bond, w/full auth. No attach. Legacy Name = PR Ord:Appt Administrator Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.